Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsored by
Senators West, Nathan-Pulliam, Carozza, Eckardt, Salling, and Serafini
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a dental practice to be owned, managed, or operated by a licensed dentist, subject to certain exceptions; authorizing an unlicensed person to take certain actions; prohibiting a licensed dentist from raising a certain defense in a certain action; repealing a certain exemption from the requirements of the Maryland Dentistry Act; authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to take certain action against certain applicants and licensees for accepting or tendering rebates or split fees; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0470
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654536/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654536/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654536/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (28-18)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {523425/1 (Senator Zirkin) Rejected (22-22)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {453124/2 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Rosapepe) Rejected (21-25)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-17)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {654536/1 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {654536/1 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Hough) Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {654536/1 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (28-18) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Floor Amendment {523425/1 (Senator Zirkin) Rejected (22-22) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Floor Amendment {453124/2 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Rosapepe) Rejected (21-25) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (29-17) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 50
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-102, 4-103, 4-301, 4-315 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM