Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Young, and Zucker
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a specified pollinator habitat plan to include specified best management practices for the designation of specified habitat areas; requiring that a specified pollinator habitat plan established by the Department of Natural Resources, the Maryland Environmental Service, and the State Highway Administration be as protective of pollinators as the Department of Agriculture's managed pollinator protection plan; prohibiting, with specified exceptions, the use of specified pesticides, seeds, or plants in a specified area; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0830
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirement and Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854233/1
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854233/1
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854233/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-6)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {173824/1 (Delegate McKay) Rejected (51-84)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {683627/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (46-90)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-26)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirement and Prohibition
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {854233/1 33
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 33
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {854233/1 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Conway) Adopted 34
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {854233/1 Adopted 35
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Third Reading Passed (41-6) 37
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 40
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Floor Amendment {173824/1 (Delegate McKay) Rejected (51-84) 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Floor Amendment {683627/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (46-90) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (110-26) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM