Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles - City of Havre de Grace
Sponsored by
Senators Cassilly, Gallion, and Jennings
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating an exception to motor vehicle registration requirements for low speed electric vehicles in the City of Havre de Grace that are owned and operated by the City of Havre de Grace; defining a "low speed electric vehicle" as a vehicle capable of a sustained speed of 20 miles per hour but not more than 25 miles per hour; providing that a person who operates a low speed electric vehicle in the City of Havre de Grace may operate the vehicle only on certain roadways and, between dusk and dawn, only under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0467
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {518779/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles - City of Havre de Grace
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {518779/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles - City of Havre de Grace
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 46A
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-130.1, 13-402, 21-104.5 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM