Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources – Sunday Hunting – St. Mary’s County
Sponsored by
Senators Bailey, Carozza, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Ready, Salling, and Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt game birds or mammals on a Sunday during the open season for that game bird or mammal on private property or certain public land in St. Mary's County under certain circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Deer
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {534932/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Sunday Hunting – St. Mary’s County
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {310215/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-11)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources – Sunday Hunting – St. Mary’s County
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Sunday Hunting – St. Mary’s County
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Deer
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {534932/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Sunday Hunting – St. Mary’s County
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 46A
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {310215/1 Adopted 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (121-11) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources – Sunday Hunting – St. Mary’s County
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Sunday Hunting – St. Mary’s County
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM