Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Boating Offenses
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher, Hough, Smith, West, Zirkin, Carter, Cassilly, Hester, Lee, Ready, and Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of certain records based on a conviction for certain criminal boating offenses.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0259
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Boating Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {938175/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Boating Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-5)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Boating Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Boating Offenses
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {938175/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Boating Offenses
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Judiciary 43
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (127-5) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Boating Offenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-725.3, 8-725.4, 8-725.5, 8-725.6, 8-726, 8-726.1, 8-727.1, 8-738.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM