Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ethics - Local Government - Conflict of Interest and Financial Disclosure
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that specified authorized modifications of local conflict of interest and financial disclosure laws and regulations be made in accordance with regulations adopted by the State Ethics Commission and consistent with specified intent; and authorizing rather than requiring a county or municipal corporation to modify specified local financial disclosure laws under specified circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 39
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 40
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-1) 42
House 3/14/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 43A
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/22/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-807, 5-808, 5-809, 5-816, 5-817 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM