Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher, Smith, and Washington
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that attempted suicide is not a crime in the State; providing that the Act may not be construed to prohibit a person who commits one or more crimes in the course of attempting to commit suicide from being charged with the other crime or crimes; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0077
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {778574/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {778574/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 66
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-101.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM