Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Protection and Restoration of State-Owned Lakes
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund is to protect and restore State-owned lakes; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to develop a specified budget; requiring any interest earnings of the Fund be credited to the Fund; requiring the Department, in coordination with local governments, organizations, and citizens, to develop an annual work plan that prioritizes and details projects that will receive funding from the Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0477
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Protection and Restoration of State-Owned Lakes
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Protection and Restoration of State-Owned Lakes
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Protection and Restoration of State-Owned Lakes
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natural Resources - Protection and Restoration of State-Owned Lakes
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable Adopted 33
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Second Reading Passed 33
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Protection and Restoration of State-Owned Lakes
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 38
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Protection and Restoration of State-Owned Lakes
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-205, 8-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM