Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Awarding a diminution credit of 60 days per program completed to reduce the term of confinement of an inmate if the inmate successfully obtains a certain educational certificate, diploma, or degree; requiring the Commissioner of Correction to establish a uniform system of deductions and participation criteria; prohibiting a certain inmate from being awarded more than 40 days of diminution credit; prohibiting a certain inmate from receiving a diminution credit under the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0089
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0812 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {868879/1
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {868879/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {868879/1 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {868879/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Judiciary 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 12:55 PM
Click to return on the top page