Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education - Regulation (Private Nonprofit Institution of Higher Education Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Augustine, Elfreth, Ferguson, Griffith, Hayes, McCray, Washington, Young, Zucker, Ellis, Lam, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, and Simonaire
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to determine whether a reportable incident constitutes private inurement if a private nonprofit institution of higher education engages in a reportable incident; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0461
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344630/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-3)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Higher Education Commission - Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education - Regulation (Private Nonprofit Institution of Higher Education Protection Act of 2019)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {344630/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Maryland Higher Education Commission - Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education - Regulation (Private Nonprofit Institution of Higher Education Protection Act of 2019)
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Appropriations 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (126-3) 53
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 11-407.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM