Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified political subdivisions to require periodic inspections of specified multifamily dwellings with balcony railings to ensure that each balcony railing meets the requirements of the applicable local housing code or the Minimum Livability Code; authorizing specified political subdivisions to conduct the inspections, authorize a third party to conduct the inspections, or require a specified professional inspector to conduct and certify the inspections in a specified manner; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0196 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {924737/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {480318/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (100-36)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Delegates Stein, Holmes, and Fraser-Hidalgo
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senators Young, Benson, and Ferguson
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-35)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {924737/1 Report Adopted 26
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 28
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 31
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {480318/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (100-36) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Requests House Recede 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 House Refuses to Recede 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Delegates Stein, Holmes, and Fraser-Hidalgo 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senators Young, Benson, and Ferguson 62
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (98-35) 70
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM