Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment – Maryland Wage and Hour Law – Agricultural Stands, Retail Farms, and Farmers’ Markets
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza, Miller, Gallion, Hester, and West
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing an exemption from the Maryland Wage and Hour Law for an individual employed at an agricultural stand, a retail farm, or a farmers' market that primarily sells agricultural products that the employer has produced.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1123
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {257477/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
44
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Agricultural Stands
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {257477/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Labor and Employment – Maryland Wage and Hour Law – Agricultural Stands, Retail Farms, and Farmers’ Markets
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Economic Matters 44
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:47 AM