Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Voting by Mail - Study
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Carter, Feldman, Patterson, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services, in consultation with the State Board of Elections and the Maryland Association of Election Officials, to study the requirements to implement voting by mail; requiring a certain analysis to include information on the administrative, technological, legal, security, and fiscal requirements to implement voting by mail; requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0426
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0476 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Legislative Services - Voting by Mail - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Department of Legislative Services - Voting by Mail - Study
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 5:16 PM