Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Nondepository Special Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Including in the Nondepository Special Fund certain fees, assessments, or revenue received by the Commissioner of Financial Regulation associated with the Commissioner's authority to investigate complaints of violations by credit card processors; requiring the Commissioner to pay into the General Fund of the State certain fines and penalties collected by the Commissioner from credit card processors; altering the purpose of the Nondepository Special Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0774
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {107874/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Nondepository Special Fund
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {107874/1 Adopted 38
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Nondepository Special Fund
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Economic Matters 41
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:45 AM