Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Carter, Augustine, Benson, Ferguson, Hayes, Lee, McCray, Nathan-Pulliam, Smith, and Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a termination provision for certain provisions of law relating to policy and reporting requirements for race-based traffic stops; requiring the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center, by September 1 each year, to post on its website in a certain location a filterable data display showing traffic stop data collected for the previous calendar year that allows a person to filter the traffic stop data by county, municipality, or law enforcement agency and to review certain visuals; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0301
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {418273/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {760113/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Washington and West)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Washington and West)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Love and Bridges)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Love and Bridges)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {673727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {673727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Ethnicity-Based or Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {418273/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53A
House 3/28/2019 3/29/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {760113/1 Adopted 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 63
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Washington and West) 62A
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Washington and West) 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Recede 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Love and Bridges) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Refuses Recede 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Love and Bridges) 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {673727/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {673727/1 Adopted 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 67
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM