Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
Sponsored by
Charles County Senators
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 190
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Charles County to adopt an ordinance to prohibit the disposal of a bulky item on a highway or on public or private property except under certain circumstances; and authorizing Charles County to impose certain penalties of imprisonment not exceeding 30 days or a fine not exceeding $5,000 or both for certain violations.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0384
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 190
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Adopted 44
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 47
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 190
Text - Chapter - Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-110 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:04 PM