Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Gaming
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified organizations in Carroll County to conduct a card game, card tournament, or casino night under specified circumstances; requiring an organization to obtain a permit from the Board of License Commissioners of Carroll County before conducting a card game, card tournament, or casino night; requiring an organization that seeks a permit to meet specified requirements; specifying that a card game, card tournament, or casino night may be managed and organized by specified organizations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0310
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0661 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Second Reading Passed 29
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 32
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 35
House 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-906, 13-906.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM