Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Sponsored by
Charles County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing Charles County to use the proceeds from the issuance of certain tax increment financing bonds for convention centers, conference centers, or visitor's centers, to maintain infrastructure improvements at the centers, and to market development districts facilities and other improvements; and authorizing Charles County to establish a special taxing district, impose ad valorem or special taxes, and issue bonds to provide financing, refinancing, or reimbursement for certain costs.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0345
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {169439/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {169439/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/27/2020 10:51 AM