Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement – State Funded Construction Projects – Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Beidle, Elfreth, Guzzone, Hayes, Kagan, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, McCray, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations to require certain bidders, contractors, and subcontractors to pay certain employee health care expenses; requiring the Department of General Services, by regulation, to establish certain procedures to certify that a bidder, contractor, or subcontractor pays certain employee health care expenses; authorizing a procurement officer to void a contract if a certain bidder fails to submit certain records within a reasonable period of time; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0680
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Responsible Workforce Development Percentage Price Preference Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {624233/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {936186/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-37)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-15)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Responsible Workforce Development Percentage Price Preference Act
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {624233/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - State Procurement – State Funded Construction Projects – Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 50
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {936186/1 Adopted 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (102-37) 63
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (29-15) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Procurement – State Funded Construction Projects – Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687
Text - Chapter - State Procurement – State Funded Construction Projects – Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-801 through 17-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM