Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the alteration of the distribution of proceeds from video lottery terminals at a facility in Allegany County after 10 years of operations at the facility.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0538
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Ways and Means 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   9-1A-01, 9-1A-26, 9-1A-27 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page