Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency from allowing the establishment of any system or program that allows a person to purchase a State lottery ticket through an electronic device that connects to the Internet, such as a personal computer or mobile device.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0813
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {415464/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable 33
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 33
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34
Text - Third - State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 36
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Ways and Means 39
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {415464/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Text - Chapter - State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-101, 9-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM