Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Benson, Ellis, Kramer, Patterson, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of certain regulations to prescribe and dispense aids for the cessation of the use of tobacco products; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, by September 1, 2021, to adopt certain regulations; requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and the Maryland Children's Health Program to provide coverage for certain services rendered by a licensed pharmacist under the Act to the same extent as certain services rendered by any other licensed health care practitioner; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1594
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0497 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Text - First - Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 4:18 PM