Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health – Confidentiality of Medical Records and Emergency Facilities List
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Augustine, Beidle, Feldman, Jennings, Reilly, Kelley, Benson, Hershey, Klausmeier, and Kramer
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 173
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "health care provider" for the purposes of provisions of law governing the confidentiality of medical records to include comprehensive crisis response centers, crisis stabilization centers, and crisis treatment centers; providing that the list of emergency facilities the Maryland Department of Health is required to publish may include comprehensive crisis response centers, crisis stabilization centers, crisis treatment centers, and outpatient mental health clinics; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0332
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {857374/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {166585/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (134-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 173
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Mental Health - Emergency Facilities List - Comprehensive Crisis Response Centers, Crisis Stabilization Centers, and Crisis Treatment Centers
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments {857374/1 Adopted 34
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Mental Health - Emergency Facilities List - Comprehensive Crisis Response Centers, Crisis Stabilization Centers, and Crisis Treatment Centers
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 37
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {166585/1 Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (134-0) 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 48A
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Mental Health – Confidentiality of Medical Records and Emergency Facilities List
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 173
Text - Chapter - Mental Health – Confidentiality of Medical Records and Emergency Facilities List
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-621, 4-301, 7.5-207 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:05 PM