Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Board Membership and Provisional Licensing Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the Secretary of Health make certain recommendations for the appointment of certain members of the State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators after consulting with certain associations and societies; requiring the Secretary to recommend to the Governor professionals who have certain qualifications for certain appointments to the Board; authorizing the Board to issue a provisional license for a period of less than 90 days; and clarifying the length of a certain provisional period.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0631
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Board Membership and Provisional Licensing Requirements
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Reassigned to Finance 15
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 9:35 AM