Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Benson, Eckardt, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission, in consultation with the Maternal and Child Health Bureau, the Vital Statistics Administration, and interested stakeholders, to conduct a study regarding the surgical birth rate in the State; requiring the Commission to examine the rate of complications, increased health care costs, and global research programs related to surgical births; requiring the Commission to report its recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before November 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0247
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM