Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds
Sponsored by
Senators West, Kelley, Klausmeier, Lam, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the County Council of Baltimore County, by ordinance, to impose development impact fees to finance the capital costs of additional or expanded public works, improvements, and facilities required to accommodate new construction or development; and requiring money collected through development impact fees used to finance the capital costs of additional or expanded public works, improvements, and facilities to be used in the surrounding community of the construction or development.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0449
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1192 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Development Impact Fees - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {479130/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-13)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Baltimore County - Development Impact Fees - Authorization
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {479130/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 42
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 43A
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (123-13) 56
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Text - Chapter - Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-701.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM