Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Accountability Program - Assessments (More Learning, Less Testing Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Benson, Brochin, Currie, DeGrange, Edwards, Feldman, Guzzone, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Mathias, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Ready, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Smith, Young, Zirkin, Zucker, and Pinsky
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop, in collaboration with specified entities and individuals, a specified middle school level social studies assessment for implementation in the 2019-2020 school year; requiring the State Board, in collaboration with specified entities and individuals, to redesign the high school level social studies assessment for implementation in the 2018-2019 school year; requiring specified county boards to establish on or before specified dates a District Committee on Assessments; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0461
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824533/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {605167/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Education - Accountability Program - Assessments (Less Testing, More Learning Act of 2017)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {824533/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Education - Accountability Program - Assessments (More Learning, Less Testing Act of 2017)
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Ways and Means 47
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {605167/1 Adopted 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Accountability Program - Assessments (More Learning, Less Testing Act of 2017)
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Text - Chapter - Education - Accountability Program - Assessments (More Learning, Less Testing Act of 2017)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM