Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Mandatory Mental Health Training – First Responders and Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Augustine, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Kelley, Rosapepe, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each first responder and law enforcement officer in the State to complete certain mental health awareness training approved by the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1470
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety – Mandatory Mental Health Training – First Responders and Law Enforcement Officers
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:06 PM