Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending from 6 months to 300 days the time periods within which a person claiming to be aggrieved by certain discriminatory acts is required to file a complaint with the Commission on Civil Rights; and providing that a complaint filed with a local human relations commission within certain time periods is deemed to have complied with certain provisions of the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0290
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1007 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
Senate 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Text - Chapter - Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:40 PM
Click to return on the top page