Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - State's Attorney - Salary
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the salary of the State's Attorney for Carroll County; providing that the State's Attorney's salary is the following percentages of the salary of a judge of the District Court of Maryland: 80%, ending on December 3, 2018, 90%, beginning on December 4, 2018, and 100%, beginning on December 3, 2019; providing thereafter, a specified salary increase will take effect at the beginning of the elected term of office and may not increase during the specified term; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0573
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - State's Attorney - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - State's Attorney - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - State's Attorney - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Carroll County - State's Attorney - Salary
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34
Text - Third - Carroll County - State's Attorney - Salary
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 39
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 69
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - State's Attorney - Salary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM