Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each Office of the State's Attorney to collect and disclose certain information relating to prosecutions and office policies to the the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services; requiring the Office to determine the manner in which the State's Attorneys transmit and publish certain information; requiring the Office to publish online certain information in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0502
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Senate 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-501 through 15-506 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:14 PM
Click to return on the top page