Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a federal home loan bank may not be stayed or prohibited from exercising certain rights with respect to certain collateral of a certain insurer-member after the 14th day following the filing of a delinquency proceeding; requiring a federal home loan bank to repurchase certain outstanding capital stock of a certain insurer-member under certain circumstances; requiring a federal home loan bank to establish a certain timeline and process within 10 business days after a request from a receiver; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0504
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Economic Matters 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/1/2021 9:17 AM
Click to return on the top page