Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Firearms Required
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Ready, Salling, Serafini, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a Baltimore City school police officer or a school resource officer to carry a firearm while present on the premises of the school to which the officer is assigned.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0884 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Firearms Required
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Firearms Required
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/6/2020 11:36 AM