Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Exemption for Disabled Veterans - Percentage of Disability
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Bates, Eckardt, Hough, Robinson, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding eligibility for a property tax exemption for the dwelling house of a disabled veteran to include veterans with a service connected disability of at least 80%; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0132 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Property Tax - Exemption for Disabled Veterans - Percentage of Disability
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM