Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Records – Compulsory Process Requests – Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training Webinar
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before September 30, 2020, the Office of the Attorney General to post on its website an advisory protocol and voluntary training webinar for health care providers regarding how to respond to compulsory process requests for medical records; requiring and authorizing the Office to consult certain entities in developing the advisory protocol and voluntary training webinar; requiring the Office to track the traffic on its website beginning on September 30, 2020, to the extent practicable; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0868
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {457178/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Medical Records - Compulsory Process Requests - Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {457178/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Text - Third - Medical Records – Compulsory Process Requests – Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training Webinar
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 67
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM