Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nonpublic Schools - Fire Drill Requirements - State Fire Prevention Code
Sponsored by
Senators King, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each nonpublic school in the State to hold fire drills in accordance with the State Fire Prevention Code, keep records of the fire drills, and send copies of the records to the State Board of Education.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1186
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {633123/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (35-101)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-29)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Nonpublic Schools - Fire Drill Requirements - State Fire Prevention Code
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 34
Text - Third - Nonpublic Schools - Fire Drill Requirements - State Fire Prevention Code
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Ways and Means 38
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53A
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Floor Amendment {633123/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (35-101) 54
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (107-29) 54
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Text - Chapter - Nonpublic Schools - Fire Drill Requirements - State Fire Prevention Code
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-408.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM