Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Bates, Edwards, Ferguson, Hershey, Salling, Serafini, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a register of wills to waive certain fees for the administration of an estate if certain real property subject to administration in the State is to be transferred to a certain individual or is encumbered by a lien and subject to sale under certain provisions of law, and the estate is unable to pay the fees by reason of poverty; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0556
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {548971/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {786585/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kelley, Cassilly and Lee)
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {548971/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of Fees
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 45
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {786585/1 Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kelley, Cassilly and Lee) 66
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM