Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Classroom Supplies Purchased by Teachers
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Hershey, and King
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for up to $250 of the unreimbursed expenses paid or incurred by an eligible teacher during a taxable year for the purchase of classroom supplies if the supplies are used by students in the classroom or the eligible teacher to prepare for or during classroom teaching; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0671
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {469036/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - School Supplies
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {469036/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Text - Third - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Classroom Supplies Purchased by Teachers
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 62
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM