Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Forestry - Mel Noland Fellowship Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Mel Noland Fellowship Program in the Department of Natural Resources to support students seeking careers in fields related to natural resources; requiring the Department and its managing organization each year to select one fellow in the field of natural resources management and one in the field of urban and community forestry; requiring that each fellow receive a $20,000 stipend; renaming a certain fund to be the Mel Noland Woodland Incentives and Fellowship Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0488
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Forestry - Mel Noland Fellowship Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204536/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Forestry - Mel Noland Fellowship Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {180218/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Forestry - Mel Noland Fellowship Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Forestry - Mel Noland Fellowship Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Forestry - Mel Noland Fellowship Program - Establishment
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {204536/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Forestry - Mel Noland Fellowship Program - Establishment
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 45
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {180218/1 Adopted 58
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Forestry - Mel Noland Fellowship Program - Establishment
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text - Chapter - Forestry - Mel Noland Fellowship Program - Establishment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-307, 5-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM