Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Ferguson, Hershey, Salling, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a landlord that requires a tenant to make payments for water or sewer utility services to the landlord to use a written lease that includes a notice that the tenant is responsible for making payments for water or sewer utility services to the landlord and to provide a copy of a certain water or sewer bill to a tenant; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1073
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {708975/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-9)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments {708975/1 Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (38-9) 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Text - Chapter - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer Bills
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM