Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Provision of Health Care Coverage to Uninsured Marylanders
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Provision of Health Care Coverage to Uninsured Marylanders; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; establishing the purpose of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to submit a final report on its recommendations and findings to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before January 1, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0949
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {577577/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {577577/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 48
House 3/24/2015 3/22/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 52
House 3/31/2015 3/31/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page