Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Worcester County - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a motor scooter or moped dealer in Worcester County to apply to the Motor Vehicle Administration for the issuance of special dealer decals; authorizing a motor scooter or moped dealer in Worcester County that attaches a special dealer decal to specified motor scooters or mopeds to, as authorized by law, drive the motor scooters or mopeds on a highway or allow, for demonstration purposes, a prospective buyer to drive the motor scooters or mopeds on a highway; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1179
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {108170/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {108170/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 60
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM