Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Months – Caribbean Heritage Month
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Augustine, Benson, Eckardt, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Kelley, Lam, Lee, Patterson, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the month of August as Caribbean Heritage Month in recognition of the contributions that Caribbean Americans have made to the State; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe Caribbean Heritage Month in Maryland properly with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0893
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {444234/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Caribbean Day in Maryland
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {444234/1 Adopted 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - General Provisions – Commemorative Months – Caribbean Heritage Month
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 3/28/2019 3/29/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Text - Chapter - General Provisions – Commemorative Months – Caribbean Heritage Month
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-504, 7-504 through 7-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM