Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Funding Method and Amortization of Unfunded Liabilities or Surpluses
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the amortization periods to be used for unfunded liabilities or surpluses of the State Retirement and Pension System; clarifying the application of a specified amortization period to specified changes; and phasing out a specified method for determining employer contribution rates for the employees' and teachers' retirement and pension systems.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0496
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Favorable 47
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Appropriations 52
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM