Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders - Coverage
Sponsored by
Senators Sydnor, Kelley, Waldstreicher, Zucker, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Feldman, Hayes, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Kramer, and Reilly
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 560
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, beginning January 1, 2021, to provide services for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome under certain circumstances and subject to a certain provision of the Act; requiring carriers to provide coverage for diagnosis, evaluation, and treatment of pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders; providing that the Act provides coverage for Rituximab only under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0447
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {957273/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {696985/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (130-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 560
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders - Coverage
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {957273/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders - Coverage
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {696985/1 Adopted 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (130-0) 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Insurance - Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders - Coverage
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 560
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders - Coverage
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   15-855 )
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:15 PM