Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Robinson, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Oaks, Reilly, Rosapepe, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the defined term "emergency vehicle" to include certain organ delivery vehicles; authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to designate an organ delivery vehicle as an emergency vehicle only if it is registered to a federally designated organ procurement organization or a professional organ transportation organization; authorizing the driver of an emergency vehicle to exercise certain privileges while transporting human organs or medical personnel; authorizing that organ delivery vehicles be equipped with certain devices; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0106
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {178570/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {178570/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 37
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 38
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Text - Chapter - Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-118, 11-142.1, 21-106, 22-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM