Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Unused Sick Leave Calculation - Clarification
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the calculation used by the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to determine the amount of creditable service a member of the State Retirement and Pension System is eligible to receive for unused sick leave at retirement.
Committees
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0495
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Special Order until 2/13 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Special Order until 2/14 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174865/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable 22
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 22
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Favorable 23
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Special Order until 2/13 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 23
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Special Order until 2/14 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 24
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 25
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Second Reading Passed 25
Senate 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 27
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 First Reading Appropriations 30
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {174865/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Passed Enrolled 61A
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM