Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Employment of Retirees - Required Break in Service
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified retired members of the State Retirement and Pension System from being employed on a permanent, temporary, or contractual basis by specified employers within 45 days of the date the individual retired; deleting obsolete provisions; making clarifying changes; providing for the effective date of specified provisions of the Act; and providing for the termination of specified provisions of the Act.
Committees
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0494
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {369739/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {414660/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {369739/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 First Reading Appropriations 47
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {414660/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-406, 23-407, 24-405.1, 25-403, 26-403, 27-406, 28-402, 29-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM