Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax – Vehicles Valued as Stock in Business and Notification on Annexation
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Eckardt, Edwards, Guzzone, King, Salling, Serafini, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that, after an annexation resolution is introduced, the chief executive or the administrative officer of the municipality shall notify commercial property owners in the area to be annexed of all personal property taxes and fees imposed by the municipality and the date, time, and place of the public hearing on the annexation; providing, in the taxable year beginning July 1, 2019, up to a 100% property tax credit that a county or municipal corporation is required to grant for the property tax imposed on certain vehicles; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1317
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {819435/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {583725/1 (Senator Peters)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {583725/1 (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {445666/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax - Vehicles Valued as Stock in Business - Alteration of Tax Credit
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {819435/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Floor Amendment {583725/1 (Senator Peters) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted 46
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Floor Amendment {583725/1 (Senator Peters) Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Property Tax – Vehicles Valued as Stock in Business and Notification on Annexation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {445666/1 Adopted 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax – Vehicles Valued as Stock in Business and Notification on Annexation
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Text - Chapter - Property Tax – Vehicles Valued as Stock in Business and Notification on Annexation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM