Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Green Purchasing Committee - Food Procurement - Greenhouse Gas Emissions
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Feldman, Kramer, Lee, Waldstreicher, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Green Purchasing Committee to develop on or before January 1, 2022, a certain methodology, in consultation with the Department of the Environment and the Department of General Services, for a unit to estimate greenhouse gas emissions that occur through the life cycle of certain food; requiring each unit to report to the Committee on the unit's progress in reducing the greenhouse gas emissions associated with food procured by the unit on or before August 1, 2024 and each August 1 thereafter; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0772
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Green Purchasing Committee - Food Procurement - Greenhouse Gas Emissions
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-203, 14-410.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:07 PM